Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Acquaviva, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1818Born
12 Mar 184224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
22 Dec 187153.8AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
31 Dec 187153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
26 Jan 189374.9DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Acquaviva (VIAF: 88623036)
Bishop Giovanni Acquaviva C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTricarico, Diocese of Tricarico
Ordained BishopSant'Apollinare, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 421
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,736
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017