Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Narbonne

Archidioecesis Narbonensis

Suppressed

To: Diocese of Carcassonne and Diocese of Montpellier



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Narbonne
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Narbonne (erected)
Archdiocese of Narbonne
445ElevatedDiocese of Narbonne Archdiocese of Narbonne
11 July 1317Territory LostArchdiocese of Narbonne Diocese of Alet (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostArchdiocese of Narbonne Diocese of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières (erected)
20 August 1317Territory LostArchdiocese of Narbonne Diocese of Limoux (erected)
28 February 1318Territory AddedDiocese of Limoux (suppressed) Archdiocese of Narbonne
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Narbonne (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Diocese of Montpellier

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Narbonne
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 356
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 253
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 280
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 582, to Page 584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.6, 16 Apr 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast