Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Vicariatus Apostolicus Alexandrinus Aegypti



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Claudio Lurati, M.C.C.I., Vicar Apostolic
  • Giuseppe Bausardo, S.D.B., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus
  • Elia Eskandr Abd Elmalak, O.F.M., Apostolic Administrator Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • United: 30 November 1987
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Egypt
  • Mailing Address: 10 rue Sidi El-Metwalli, Alexandrie, Egypte
  • Telephone: (03)487.6065
  • Fax: 487.8169

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Egypt and Arabia
18 May 1839ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Syria, Egypt, Arabia, and Cyprus Prefecture Apostolic of Abyssinia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Egypt and Arabia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto)
1851Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Egypt and Arabia Vicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto)
1884Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto) Prefecture Apostolic of Delta of the Nile (erected)
13 September 1894Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Delta of the Nile
Vicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto)
Prefecture Apostolic of Eritrea (erected)
12 July 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto) Vicariate Apostolic of Canale di Suez {Suez Canal} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria in Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
27 January 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto) Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria in Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)
30 November 1987UnitedVicariate Apostolic of Alexandria in Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto
Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Egypt (Egitto)
194932,00011,509,000.3%311912226226591528ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria in Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
19709,40822,000,000.0%2687013411563535ap1971
19809,00011031048617078212ap1981
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)
19908,1148155163492361,05923ap1991
19999,57091521615922382217ap2000
20009,50091701795324084817ap2001
200110,0009165174571021487017ap2002
20029,000715916654326277617ap2003
200332,0006165171187222977817ap2004
200430,000519019515329383217ap2005
201022,27029799224114372616ap2011
201445,0004196200225725868116ap2015
201764,000516917436722060416ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast