Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ramón Sarrió Cucarella, M. Afr.

Bishop of Laghouat, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1971 Born
2 Jun 200129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
25 Jan 202553.5AppointedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
19 Mar 202553.6Ordained BishopBishop of Laghouat, Algeria

MicroData Summary
Diego Ramón Sarrió Cucarella
Bishop Diego Ramón Sarrió Cucarella M. Afr.
(born )
Bishop of Laghouat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Laghouat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2025
  • i: CL, 26 Feb 2025
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2025
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 263, Number 21,719

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 14 May 2025