Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Floro Frondosa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capiz, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1909Born
8 Mar 193626.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 195242.7AppointedBishop of Capiz, Philippines
28 May 195242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Capiz, Philippines
17 Jan 197666.5AppointedArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
18 Jun 198677.0RetiredArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
19 Sep 199384.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capiz, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio Floro Frondosa
Archbishop Antonio Floro Frondosa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumalag

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 47
  • mn: CB, 28 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast