Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Macanan Navarra

Bishop Emeritus of Bacolod, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1939 Born
7 Apr 196223.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 197940.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Capiz, Philippines
23 Apr 197940.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Velefi
26 Jun 197940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Velefi
21 Nov 198748.8AppointedBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines
24 May 200162.3AppointedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
24 May 201677.3RetiredBishop of Bacolod, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Vicente Macanan Navarra
Bishop Vicente Macanan Navarra (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bacolod

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMambusao
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Mount Carmel, Roxas City, Archdiocese of Capiz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bacolod.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast