Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jose Fuerte Cardinal Advincula

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines

Cardinal-Priest of San Vigilio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1952 Born
14 Apr 197624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Capiz, Philippines
25 Jul 200149.3AppointedBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
8 Sep 200149.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
11 Sep 200149.4InstalledBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
9 Nov 201159.6AppointedArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
11 Jan 201259.7InstalledArchbishop of Capiz, Philippines
28 Nov 202068.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202068.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vigilio
25 Mar 202168.9AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
24 Jun 202169.2InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Fuerte Advincula
Jose Fuerte Cardinal Advincula (born ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumalag, Archdiocese of Capiz
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Roxas City, Archdiocese of Capiz
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Roxas City, Archdiocese of Capiz

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Manila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2011
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,043
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • card: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • cpri: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2021
  • i: CB, 15 May 2021
  • i: CB, 3 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jun 2021

Quantcast