Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2 Oct 1976 | Born | ||
15 Aug 2002 | 25.8 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México |
13 May 2023 | 46.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México |
13 May 2023 | 46.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Tamada |
26 Jul 2023 | 46.8 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Tamada |
(VIAF: 31151836533320402516; WikiData: Q93258948)
Bishop
Carlos Alberto
Santos García
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Monterrey
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León |
Ordained Bishop | Nuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠