Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christopher Charles Prowse

Archbishop of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia

Apostolic Administrator of Australia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1953 Born
16 Aug 198026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
4 Apr 200349.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
4 Apr 200349.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bahanna
19 May 200349.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bahanna
18 Jun 200955.5AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
15 Jul 200955.6InstalledBishop of Sale, Australia
12 Sep 201359.8AppointedArchbishop of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia
19 Nov 201360.0InstalledArchbishop of Canberra-Goulburn, Australia
12 Sep 201662.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wagga Wagga, Australia
22 Jul 202066.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Wagga Wagga, Australia
24 May 202167.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Australia, Military

MicroData Summary for Christopher Charles Prowse
Archbishop Christopher Charles Prowse (born ) Archbishop of Canberra-Goulburn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEast Melbourne
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Canberra-Goulburn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,382
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2013
  • i: CB, 12 Sep 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2016
  • ab: CB, 24 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 May 2021

Quantcast