Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Gerard Percy

Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia

Titular Bishop of Appiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1963 Born
14 Dec 199027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Canberra (and Goulburn), Australia
11 Feb 202561.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
11 Feb 202561.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Appiaria
2 May 202562.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appiaria

MicroData Summary
Anthony Gerard Percy
Bishop Anthony Gerard Percy
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSydney, Archdiocese of Sydney
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Sydney.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2025
  • bp/ob: CB, 11 Feb 2025
  • c2: CB, 1 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 2 May 2025