Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Michael O’Regan

Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1958 Born
2 Sep 198324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst, Australia
4 Dec 201456.1AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
26 Feb 201556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sale, Australia
19 Mar 202061.4AppointedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
25 May 202061.6InstalledArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Michael O’Regan
Archbishop Patrick Michael O’Regan (born ) Archbishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBathurst
Ordained BishopPhelan Stadium, Sale, Diocese of Sale

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Adelaide.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,375
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 8 Dec 2020

Quantcast