Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Wilfrid Fox Cardinal Napier, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Durban, South Africa

Cardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi ad Acilia

Apostolic Administrator of Eshowe

Member of the Council for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1941 Born
25 Jul 197029.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 May 197837.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kokstad, South Africa
29 Nov 198039.7AppointedBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
28 Feb 198139.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
29 Mar 199251.0AppointedArchbishop of Durban, South Africa
1 Aug 199453.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Umzimkulu, South Africa
21 Feb 200159.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200159.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi ad Acilia
14 Mar 200968.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Umzimkulu, South Africa
8 Mar 201473.0AppointedMember of the Council for the Economy
9 Feb 202179.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eshowe, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Wilfrid Fox Napier (VIAF: 307167135)
Wilfrid Fox Cardinal Napier O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Durban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwartberg, Vicariate Apostolic of Kokstad
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Kokstad, Diocese of Kokstad
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Kokstad, Diocese of Kokstad

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Durban.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,479
  • aadm: CB, 17 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast