Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xolelo Thaddaeus Kumalo

Bishop of Witbank, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1954 Born
10 Oct 199137.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bethlehem, South Africa
11 Mar 200853.6AppointedBishop of Eshowe, South Africa
7 Jun 200853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Eshowe, South Africa
25 Nov 202066.3AppointedBishop of Witbank, South Africa
20 Mar 202166.7InstalledBishop of Witbank, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Xolelo Thaddaeus Kumalo
Bishop Xolelo Thaddaeus Kumalo (born ) Bishop of Witbank

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGogela
Ordained BishopGround of, Little Flower School, Eshowe, Diocese of Eshowe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Witbank.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2008
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,757
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2020
  • i: CB, 19 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast