Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javier Múnera Correa, I.M.C.

Archbishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1956 Born
25 Dec 198125.1Perpetual VowsMember of Consolata Missionaries
8 Aug 198225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
28 Nov 199842.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo, Colombia
28 Nov 199842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
11 Feb 199942.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Numidia
30 May 201962.6AppointedBishop of San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia
10 Aug 201962.8InstalledBishop of San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia
25 Mar 202164.4AppointedArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
22 May 202164.5InstalledArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Múnera Correa
Archbishop Francisco Javier Múnera Correa I.M.C. (born ) Archbishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCopacabana, Archdiocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santafé de Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cartagena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,477
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2019
  • i: CB, 9 Aug 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2021
  • i: AM, 25 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 May 2021

Quantcast