Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio José Jaramillo Tobón

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jericó, Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Cotrada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1886Born
10 Nov 191226.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 194255.2AppointedBishop of Jericó, Colombia
12 Apr 194255.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jericó, Colombia
31 Mar 196073.4RetiredBishop of Jericó, Colombia
31 Mar 196073.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotrada
27 Apr 196982.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Jericó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Jaramillo Tobón
Archbishop Antonio José Jaramillo Tobón (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jericó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelmira
Ordained BishopCathedral, Jericó, Diocese of Jericó
Death PlaceMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast