Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacó (Jacob) Roberto Hilgert

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1926Born
30 Nov 195226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 Jul 197650.4AppointedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Sep 197650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 May 200276.2RetiredBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Dec 202094.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jacó (Jacob) Roberto Hilgert
Bishop Jacó (Jacob) Roberto Hilgert (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarmonia
Ordained BishopCamaquã
Death PlaceCruz Alta, Diocese of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,440
  • c1/d: CB, 17 Dec 2020
  • ob.loc: CB, 2 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 3 Jan 2021

Quantcast