Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ivo Lorscheiter

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1927Born
20 Dec 195225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 196537.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 196537.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamada
6 Mar 196638.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamada
5 Feb 197446.1AppointedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
24 Mar 200476.2RetiredBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Mar 200779.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Ivo Lorscheiter
Bishop José Ivo Lorscheiter (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Maria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão José do Hortêncio, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • bd/opd: CB, 11 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast