Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rafael Tambao-An Cruz

Bishop-Elect of Baguio, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1960 Born
8 Sep 198525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
20 Jun 202464.2AppointedBishop of Baguio, Philippines
7 Sep 202464.4Ordained BishopBishop of Baguio, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Rafael Tambao-An Cruz
(VIAF: 2180323; WikiData: Q126738977)
Father Rafael Tambao-An Cruz (born ) Bishop-Elect of Baguio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMapandan, Pangasinan, Diocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Dagupan, Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Baguio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2024
  • mn: CB, 20 Jun 2024
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 3 Jul 2024