Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Bustillo, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1968 Born
12 Sep 198718.8Simple VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Sep 199223.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 Sep 199425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
11 May 202152.4AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
13 Jun 202152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Bustillo
Bishop François-Xavier Bustillo O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Ajaccio, Diocese of Ajaccio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ajaccio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2021
  • simp/ob: CB, 11 May 2021
  • c2: CB, 19 May 2021
  • c34: CB, 13 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jun 2021

Quantcast