Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Parsegh (Manuel) Baghdassarian, I.C.P.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Our Lady of Nareg in Glendale (Armenian), California, USA

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1975 Born
2 Sep 200025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergť Patriarcal de Bzommar
3 Apr 202449.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Our Lady of Nareg in Glendale (Armenian), California, USA
3 Apr 202449.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
15 Jun 202449.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae

MicroData Summary for Parsegh (Manuel) Baghdassarian
(WikiData: Q125295933)
Bishop Parsegh (Manuel) Baghdassarian I.C.P.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Our Lady of Nareg in Glendale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeirut, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
Ordained PriestSaint-…lie et Saint Grťgoire l'Illuminateur, Cathedral, Beirut, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
Ordained BishopSt. Savior, Church, Bourj Hammoud, Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Our Lady of Nareg in Glendale (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2024
  • c1: CB, 3 Apr 2024
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Apr 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 16 Jun 2024