Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jean Pierre XVIII Kasparian, I.C.P.B. †

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1927Born
13 Apr 195225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
6 Dec 197245.8AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq
25 Feb 197346.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq
5 Aug 198255.5ElectedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
5 Aug 198255.5ElectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
7 Aug 198255.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
7 Aug 198255.5ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
28 Nov 199871.8RetiredPatriarch of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
28 Nov 199871.8RetiredBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
16 Jan 201183.9DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Jean Pierre XVIII Kasparian
Patriarch Jean Pierre XVIII Kasparian I.C.P.B. (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Cilicia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Caire
Ordained BishopSaint Elias and Saint Gregory the Illuminator, Cathedral, Beirut

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Oct 2021

Quantcast