Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boutros Marayati

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria

Patriarchal Administrator of Cilicia (Armenian)

Apostolic Administrator of Kamichlié (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1948 Born
4 Jul 197123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
21 Aug 198941.4AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
4 Feb 199041.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
10 Apr 199244.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kamichlié (Armenian), Syria
26 May 202173.2AppointedPatriarchal Administrator of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
24 Oct 202173.6CeasedPatriarchal Administrator of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Boutros Marayati
Archbishop Boutros Marayati (born ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alep

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,185
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 May 2021
  • aadm: CB, 27 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Oct 2021

Quantcast