Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
6 Jun 1969 | Born | ||
31 Oct 1999 | 30.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria |
27 Sep 2016 | 47.3 | Appointed | Administrator of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq |
23 Jun 2018 | 49.0 | Appointed | Apostolic Administrator of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq |
10 May 2019 | 49.9 | Appointed | Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem and Amman {Gerusalemme e Amman} (Armenian), Palestine |
11 Sep 2022 | 53.2 | Ceased | Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem and Amman {Gerusalemme e Amman} (Armenian), Palestine |
27 May 2023 | 53.9 | Confirmed | Archbishop of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq |
27 Aug 2023 | 54.2 | Ordained Bishop | Archbishop of Baghdad (Armenian), Iraq |
(WikiData: Q55163693)
Archbishop
Nersès (Joseph)
Zabarian (Zabbara)
(born )
Archbishop
of Baghdad
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Aleppo, Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria |
Ordained Bishop | Notre-Dame de l'Assomption, Syriac, Cathedral, Alep, Archeparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠