Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patricio Hacbang Alo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mati, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1939Born
14 Mar 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
14 Apr 198141.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
14 Apr 198141.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
7 Jun 198141.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
9 Nov 198444.9AppointedBishop of Mati, Philippines
19 Oct 201474.8ResignedBishop of Mati, Philippines
13 Apr 202181.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mati, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Patricio Hacbang Alo
Bishop Patricio Hacbang Alo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCebu, Archdiocese of Cebu
Ordained BishopCebu, Archdiocese of Cebu
Death PlaceBishop Joseph Regan Memorial, Hospital, Tagum City

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,925
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d/opd/c1: CB, 13 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Apr 2021

Quantcast