Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pontifical Council for Social Communications

Pontificium Consilium de Communicationibus Socialibus

Suppressed



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Commission for Educational and Religious Films
17 September 1948ErectedPontifical Commission for Educational and Religious Films (erected)
Pontifical Commission for Social Communications
2 April 1964Name ChangedPontifical Commission for Educational and Religious Films Pontifical Commission for Social Communications
Pontifical Council for Social Communications
28 June 1988ElevatedPontifical Commission for Social Communications Pontifical Council for Social Communications
March 2016SuppressedPontifical Council for Social Communications (suppressed)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016