Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyprian Kazimierz von Wolicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1714BornSkomlinen
8 Dec 173723.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 176651.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
14 Apr 176651.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
15 Jun 176651.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
May 177560.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Cyprian Kazimierz von Wolicki:
Bishop Cyprian Kazimierz von Wolicki Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013