Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Arnold von Wolff-Metternich zur Gracht

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1658BornKöln
23 Aug 170345.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paderborn, Germany
26 Aug 170345.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
15 Sep 170345.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
17 Dec 170345.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
17 Dec 170345.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
9 Mar 170445.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
21 May 170446.0SucceededBishop of Paderborn, Germany
8 Jun 170749.0AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
25 Dec 171860.6DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Arnold von Wolff-Metternich zur Gracht:
Bishop Franz Arnold von Wolff-Metternich zur Gracht (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 15.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 272, and Page 288
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015