Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Weld, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana, Guyana

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1883BornBirkdale, Great Britain
31 Jul 191733.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jan 193248.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
12 Jan 193248.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
15 May 193248.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
18 Jul 195470.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
10 Feb 195975.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for George Weld:
Bishop George Weld S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013