Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Ludwig Franz von Wangen zu Geroldseck

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1727Born
15 Mar 176639.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
29 May 177548.2SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
13 Nov 177548.6ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
3 Mar 177648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
11 Oct 178255.5DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Ludwig Franz von Wangen zu Geroldseck
Bishop Friedrich Ludwig Franz von Wangen zu Geroldseck (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilwisheim

  • a priest for 16.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe der Deutschsprachigen Lńnder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1776, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018