Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Wahl

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

Titular Bishop of Cucusus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1831Born
9 Aug 185624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
11 Jul 189058.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
11 Jul 189058.8AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
11 Jul 189058.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cucusus
20 Jul 189058.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cucusus
190068.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
190068.3ResignedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
6 Jun 190573.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Wahl (VIAF: 107803692)
Bishop Ludwig Wahl (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saxonia (Saxony)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBad Waldsee
Ordained BishopKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017