Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anđelko Voršak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1844Born
22 May 186924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
24 Mar 189853.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
24 Mar 189853.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
19 May 189853.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
22 Aug 192176.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Anđelko Voršak
Bishop Anđelko Voršak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlok, Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem
Ordained BishopDjakovo, Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,971
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,898, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast