Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Baptiste Volfius] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Côte-d'Or (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1734Born
16 Feb 179156.8SelectedBishop of [Côte-d'Or (Constitutional), France]
13 Mar 179156.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Côte-d'Or (Constitutional), France]
14 Oct 180167.5ResignedBishop of [Côte-d'Or (Constitutional), France]
8 Feb 182287.8DiedBishop Emeritus of [Côte-d'Or (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Volfius (VIAF: 224758079)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Volfius (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Côte-d'Or

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon
Ordained BishopOratoire, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast