Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop NoŽl-Gabriel-Luce de Villar] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1748Born
22 Mar 179142.2SelectedBishop of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]
22 May 179142.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]
3 Oct 179849.8ResignedBishop of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]
28 Aug 182677.7DiedBishop Emeritus of [Mayenne (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for NoŽl-Gabriel-Luce de Villar (VIAF: 36942096)
Bishop NoŽl-Gabriel-Luce de Villar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mayenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1791, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast