Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Denis de Vienne

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1739Born
18 Dec 177536.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
18 Dec 177536.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
14 Jan 177636.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
1793¹53.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Denis de Vienne (VIAF: 173381830)
Bishop Jean-Denis de Vienne (born , died 1793) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Germain-en-Laye

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 368, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,776, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast