Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Vey, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand

Titular Bishop of Gerasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1840Born
10 Jun 186525.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
30 Jul 187535.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand
30 Jul 187535.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
5 Dec 187535.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
21 Feb 190969.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Vey (VIAF: 283310589)
Bishop Jean-Louis Vey M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraules, France
Ordained BishopSt. Francois Xavier, Bangkok

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017