Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maksimilijan Verhovácz (Vrhovac)

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1752BornKarlovac
23 Sep 177522.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Dec 177523.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 178734.7SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
10 Mar 178835.2ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
13 Apr 178835.3Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
16 Dec 182775.0DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Maksimilijan Verhovácz (Vrhovac)
Bishop Maksimilijan Verhovácz (Vrhovac) (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 448
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,786
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016