Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislaus Luzénszky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1732³BornSavoly
22 Feb 175522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 175523.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 177947.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
13 Dec 177947.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
2 Feb 178047.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
21 Mar 179259.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ladislaus Luzénszky:
Bishop Ladislaus Luzénszky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015