Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stephen Vaughan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salford, England

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1853BornCourtfield, Ross on Wye
4 Jun 187623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 190956.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 190956.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
15 Aug 190956.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
4 Dec 192572.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Stephen Vaughan:
Bishop John Stephen Vaughan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salford

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 47
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014