Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Unfried Gimpel, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1919BornOrnbau, Germany
30 Apr 195030.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Mar 196949.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
13 Mar 196949.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dolia
11 May 196949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dolia
19 Sep 198061.0AppointedPrelate of Tarma, Peru
21 Dec 198566.3AppointedBishop of Tarma, Peru
29 Nov 198869.2DiedBishop of Tarma, Peru

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Unfried Gimpel:
Bishop Lorenzo Unfried Gimpel M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarma

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013