Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Pierre-Anastase Torné] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Cher (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1727Born
11 Apr 179164.2SelectedBishop of [Cher (Constitutional), France]
26 Apr 179164.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Cher (Constitutional), France]
12 Nov 179366.8ResignedBishop of [Cher (Constitutional), France]
14 Jan 179769.9DiedBishop Emeritus of [Cher (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Anastase Torné (VIAF: 56719233)
Bishop Pierre-Anastase Torné (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarbes
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceTarbes

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 13 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast