Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Secundo Tagliabue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1907Born
28 Jun 193123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vercelli, Italy
25 Jan 195749.4AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
19 Mar 195749.6Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
22 Aug 197063.0ResignedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
22 Aug 197063.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bure
6 Jan 197668.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Bure
9 Feb 198375.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Secundo Tagliabue
Bishop Secundo Tagliabue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anglona-Tursi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaresanablot

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast