Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marijan Šunjić, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Paneade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1798¹Born
3 Oct 185456.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
3 Oct 185456.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Paneade
18 Feb 185557.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paneade
28 Sep 186062.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marijan Šunjić (VIAF: 72204284)
Bishop Marijan Šunjić O.F.M. Obs. (born 1798, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bosnia (Bosna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBucich, Diocese of Bosnia (Bosna)

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 437
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1855, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016