Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Philippe Charles François Seguin] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1741Born
15 Feb 179150.0SelectedBishop of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]
27 Mar 179150.1Ordained BishopBishop of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]
1796²54.9ResignedBishop of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]
21 Jan 181271.0DiedBishop Emeritus of [Doubs (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe Charles François Seguin (VIAF: 9956253)
Bishop Philippe Charles François Seguin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Doubs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBesançon
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBesançon

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Oct 2018

Quantcast