Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis José Gabriel Segura y Cubas

Deceased

Bishop of Paraná, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1803Born
1 May 182925.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 May 182925.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 185955.8AppointedBishop of Paraná, Argentina
19 Aug 186056.9Ordained BishopBishop of Paraná, Argentina
13 Oct 186259.1DiedBishop of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis José Gabriel Segura y Cubas
Bishop Luis José Gabriel Segura y Cubas (born , died ) Bishop of Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatamarca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paraná, Diocese of Paraná

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018