Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Barthélémy-Jean-Baptiste Sanadon] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Basses-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1729Born
1 Mar 179162.0SelectedBishop of [Basses-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]
26 Apr 179162.2Ordained BishopBishop of [Basses-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]
9 Jan 179666.9DiedBishop of [Basses-Pyrénées (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Barthélémy-Jean-Baptiste Sanadon (VIAF: 9956564)
Bishop Barthélémy-Jean-Baptiste Sanadon (born , died ) Bishop of Basses-Pyrénées

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaumesnil
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceOloron

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 13 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast