Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Martire Rusca, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
14 Feb 165641.1AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
20 Feb 165641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
29 Apr 167459.3DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Martire Rusca
Bishop Pietro Martire Rusca O.F.M. Conv. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Caorle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 133
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 25
  • ob/c2: AT, 30 Oct 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018