Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Redner

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1828BornNeuenburg
17 Apr 185324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
16 Nov 188658.2AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 Jan 188758.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Apr 1898³69.6DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo Redner:
Bishop Leo Redner (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013