Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Théophile-Zotique Racicot

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Pogla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1845Born
6 Nov 187025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
14 Jan 190559.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
14 Jan 190559.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pogla
3 May 190559.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pogla
14 Sep 191569.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for François-Théophile-Zotique Racicot
Bishop François-Théophile-Zotique Racicot (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSault-au-Récollet

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast