Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymund Ferdinand von Rabatta

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1669Born
20 May 170031.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passau, Germany
5 Jun 170031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
14 Jan 171343.9SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
18 Sep 171344.6ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
1 May 171445.2Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
26 Oct 172253.7DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Raymund Ferdinand von Rabatta
Bishop Raymund Ferdinand von Rabatta (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorizia
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 10
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast