Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando del Portillo y Torres, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1728Born
15 Sep 178860.1AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
28 Jun 178960.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Oct 179870.2AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
20 Jan 180475.4DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fernando del Portillo y Torres
Archbishop Fernando del Portillo y Torres O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad Real, Spain

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 199
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 107, Number 553
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast